Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1225 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 13, 2024
Fiscal Note February 14, 2024
Bill February 8, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2024
Bill March 1, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 16, 2024

Amended

Bill March 28, 2024
Bill March 27, 2024