Senate | 05/04/2024 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance | ||
House | 05/03/2024 | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |