Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1245 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 6, 2024
Fiscal Note April 29, 2024
Fiscal Note March 19, 2024
Bill February 12, 2024

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2024
Bill May 2, 2024