LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1262
Draft Versions
CO
Colorado House Bill HB1262
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2024 Regular Session
Colorado House Bill HB1262
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
July 23, 2024
Fiscal Note
April 15, 2024
Fiscal Note
March 26, 2024
Fiscal Note
February 26, 2024
Bill
February 13, 2024
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 17, 2024
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 29, 2024
Compare
Amended
Bill
May 4, 2024
Compare
Bill
May 3, 2024
Compare