Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1266 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 24, 2024
Fiscal Note February 28, 2024
Bill February 13, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 18, 2024
Bill March 15, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2024

Amended

Bill April 22, 2024
Bill April 19, 2024