Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1286 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 29, 2024
Fiscal Note April 16, 2024
Fiscal Note March 27, 2024
Fiscal Note March 1, 2024
Bill February 13, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2024
Bill April 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2024

Amended

Bill May 2, 2024