Senate | 05/01/2024 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs | ||
House | 04/20/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/19/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/12/2024 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |