LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1296
Draft Versions
CO
Colorado House Bill HB1296
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2024 Regular Session
Colorado House Bill HB1296
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
June 6, 2024
Fiscal Note
April 30, 2024
Fiscal Note
March 18, 2024
Fiscal Note
February 27, 2024
Bill
February 14, 2024
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 21, 2024
Compare
Bill
April 20, 2024
Compare