LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1307
Draft Versions
CO
Colorado House Bill HB1307
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2024 Regular Session
Colorado House Bill HB1307
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
June 6, 2024
Fiscal Note
April 30, 2024
Fiscal Note
March 27, 2024
Fiscal Note
March 4, 2024
Bill
February 14, 2024
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 26, 2024
Compare
Bill
April 25, 2024
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 13, 2024
Compare
Amended
Bill
May 8, 2024
Compare
Bill
May 7, 2024
Compare