|
05/31/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/29/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2024
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/03/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Committee on Local Government & Housing Refer Unamended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government & Housing
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2024
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government
|
|
|