Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1308 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 6, 2024
Bill February 14, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2024
Bill April 22, 2024
Bill April 20, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2024

Amended

Bill May 4, 2024
Bill May 3, 2024