Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1315 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 21, 2024
Fiscal Note March 1, 2024
Bill February 20, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2024

Amended

Bill May 8, 2024
Bill May 6, 2024