05/24/2024 | Governor Signed | |||
05/15/2024 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/26/2024 | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |