Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1321 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 24, 2024
Fiscal Note March 19, 2024
Fiscal Note February 29, 2024
Bill February 20, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2024
Bill March 8, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 14, 2024

Amended

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill April 26, 2024