|
05/22/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/16/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2024
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government
|
|
|