Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1334 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 12, 2024
Fiscal Note March 6, 2024
Bill February 23, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 25, 2024
Bill March 22, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2024

Amended

Bill April 30, 2024
Bill April 29, 2024