|
05/28/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Senate Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Legislative Council
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
|
|
|