Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1368 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 10, 2024
Fiscal Note March 19, 2024
Bill March 11, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2024
Bill April 15, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2024

Amended

Bill May 2, 2024