Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1370 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 15, 2024
Fiscal Note March 25, 2024
Bill March 11, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2024
Bill April 24, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 14, 2024

Amended

Bill May 4, 2024
Bill May 3, 2024