Senate | 05/07/2024 | Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | Senate Committee on Finance Lay Over Amended | ||
Senate | 05/05/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance | ||
House | 05/04/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 05/03/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Finance | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |