Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1373 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 28, 2024
Fiscal Note May 6, 2024
Fiscal Note April 10, 2024
Fiscal Note April 2, 2024
Bill March 12, 2024

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2024