05/15/2024 | Governor Signed | |||
05/03/2024 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 05/02/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |