Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1374 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 25, 2024
Fiscal Note March 13, 2024
Bill March 12, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 8, 2024
Bill April 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2024

Amended

Bill April 23, 2024
Bill April 22, 2024