Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1393 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 1, 2024
Fiscal Note March 26, 2024
Bill March 25, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 1, 2024
Bill March 28, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 9, 2024

Amended

Bill April 5, 2024
Bill April 4, 2024