06/06/2024 | Governor Signed | |||
05/17/2024 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/17/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 05/17/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 05/04/2024 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 05/04/2024 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/26/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |