Senate | 05/01/2024 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely | ||
Senate | 04/26/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |