Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1433 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 28, 2024
Fiscal Note April 5, 2024
Bill April 1, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2024
Bill April 24, 2024