Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1439 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 14, 2024
Fiscal Note May 4, 2024
Fiscal Note May 2, 2024
Fiscal Note April 11, 2024
Bill April 2, 2024

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2024
Bill April 30, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 7, 2024

Amended

Bill May 6, 2024
Bill May 4, 2024