LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1460
Action History
CO
Colorado House Bill HB1460
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2024 Regular Session
Colorado House Bill HB1460
Action History
House
05/03/2024
House Third Reading Lost with Amendments - Floor
House
05/02/2024
House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
House
04/26/2024
House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
House
04/23/2024
House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
House
04/17/2024
Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary