LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1460
Draft Versions
CO
Colorado House Bill HB1460
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2024 Regular Session
Colorado House Bill HB1460
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
July 3, 2024
Fiscal Note
May 2, 2024
Fiscal Note
April 29, 2024
Fiscal Note
April 24, 2024
Fiscal Note
April 22, 2024
Bill
April 17, 2024
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
May 2, 2024
Compare