LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HJR1023
Action History
CO
Colorado House Bill HJR1023
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2024 Regular Session
Colorado House Bill HJR1023
Action History
House
05/08/2024
House Third Reading Laid Over to 05/09/2024 - No Amendments
House
04/24/2024
House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
House
04/22/2024
House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
House
04/08/2024
Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs