03/15/2024 | Governor Signed | |||
03/12/2024 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 03/11/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | House Committee on Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |