LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB005
Draft Versions
CO
Colorado Senate Bill SB005
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2024 Regular Session
Colorado Senate Bill SB005
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
June 3, 2024
Fiscal Note
February 23, 2024
Fiscal Note
January 11, 2024
Bill
January 10, 2024
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
January 31, 2024
Compare
Bill
January 30, 2024
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
March 5, 2024
Compare
Amended
Bill
February 29, 2024
Compare
Bill
February 28, 2024
Compare