Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB019 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/21/2024

                    Second Regular Session
Seventy-fourth General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
REVISED
This Version Includes All Amendments Adopted
on Second Reading in the Second House
LLS NO. 24-0446.01 Yelana Love x2295
SENATE BILL 24-019
Senate Committees House Committees
Finance Transportation, Housing & Local Government
Appropriations Appropriations
A BILL FOR AN ACT
C
ONCERNING REMUNERATION -EXEMPT IDENTIFYING PLACARDS , AND,
101
IN CONNECTION THEREWITH , MAKING AN APPROPRIATION .102
Bill Summary
(Note:  This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
http://leg.colorado.gov
.)
Current law exempts an individual with a remuneration-exempt
identifying placard from paying at a parking device. The bill defines
"parking device" as a single- or multi-space meter, kiosk, pay station,
pay-by-space, pay-by-plate, pay-by-card, or other payment system or
methodology for the parking of vehicles.
The bill also:
HOUSE
Amended 2nd Reading
April 20, 2024
SENATE
3rd Reading Unamended
March 15, 2024
SENATE
Amended 2nd Reading
March 13, 2024
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Smallwood and Kolker, Fields, Gonzales, Marchman, Priola
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
Vigil and Soper,
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law.
Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. ! Clarifies that a remuneration-exempt parking placard does
not count toward the limits on the number of disability
identifying placards and license plates the department of
revenue (department) may issue to an individual;
! Increases the number of remuneration-exempt placards that
the department may issue to an individual from one placard
to 2 placards; and
! Specifies that an individual with a placard is exempt from
paying at a parking device within a parking lot.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 42-3-204, amend2
(3)(b)(I)(B); and add (1)(g.5) as follows:3
42-3-204.  Reserved parking for persons with disabilities -4
applicability - definitions - rules. (1)  Definitions. As used in this5
section:6
(g.5)  "P
ARKING DEVICE" MEANS A SINGLE- OR MULTI-SPACE7
METER, KIOSK, PAY STATION , PAY-BY-SPACE, PAY-BY-PLATE,8
PAY-BY-CARD, OR OTHER PAYMENT SYSTEM OR METHODOLOGY FOR THE9
PARKING OF VEHICLES.10
(3)  Types of plates or placards. (b)  Number of placards and11
license plates allowed. (I) (B)  The department may issue one
 TWO12
remuneration-exempt identifying placard PLACARDS to an eligible13
individual. A
 REMUNERATION-EXEMPT IDENTIFYING PLACARD DOES NOT14
COUNT TOWARD THE LIMITS ON PLACARDS AND PLATES SPECIFIED IN15
SUBSECTION (3)(b)(I)(A) OF THIS SECTION.16
SECTION 2. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 42-4-1212, amend17
(1) as follows:18
42-4-1212.  Pay parking access for persons with disabilities.19
(1)  A person who owns, operates, or manages a parking space,20
019-2- INCLUDING A PARKING SPACE WITHIN A PARKING LOT , that requires1
remuneration 
PAID THROUGH A PARKING DEVICE shall not tow, boot, or2
otherwise take adverse action against an individual or motor vehicle3
parking in the space for failure to pay the remuneration if the motor4
vehicle bears a remuneration-exempt identifying placard issued pursuant5
to section 42-3-204.6
SECTION 3. Appropriation. (1)  For the 2024-25 state fiscal
7
year, $10,447 is appropriated to the department of revenue. This8
appropriation is from the Colorado DRIVES vehicle services account in9
the highway users tax fund created in section 42-1-211 (2), C.R.S. To10
implement this act, the department may use this appropriation as follows:11
(a)  $7,936 for DRIVES maintenance and support;12
(b)  $384 for personal services related to vehicle services; 13
(c)  $840 for personal services related to administration and14
support; and15
(d)  $1,287 for payments to OIT.16
(2)  For the 2024-25 state fiscal year, $335 is appropriated to the17
department of revenue for use by the division of motor vehicles. This18
appropriation is from the license plate cash fund created in section19
42-3-301 (1)(b), C.R.S. To implement this act, the division may use this20
appropriation for license plate ordering.21
     22
SECTION 4. Act subject to petition - effective date. This act23
takes effect November 1, 2024; except that, if a referendum petition is24
filed pursuant to section 1 (3) of article V of the state constitution against25
this act or an item, section, or part of this act within the ninety-day period26
after final adjournment of the general assembly, then the act, item,27
019
-3- section, or part will not take effect unless approved by the people at the1
general election to be held in November 2024 and, in such case, will take2
effect on the date of the official declaration of the vote thereon by the3
governor.4
019
-4-