Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB019 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 30, 2024
Fiscal Note March 29, 2024
Fiscal Note January 24, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 15, 2024
Bill March 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2024

Amended

Bill April 22, 2024
Bill April 21, 2024