Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB037 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 31, 2024
Fiscal Note April 18, 2024
Fiscal Note March 18, 2024
Fiscal Note January 11, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2024
Bill April 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 7, 2024

Amended

Bill May 3, 2024