Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB042 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 26, 2024
Fiscal Note April 17, 2024
Fiscal Note February 9, 2024
Fiscal Note January 26, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2024
Bill April 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 14, 2024

Amended

Bill May 3, 2024
Bill May 2, 2024