|
06/05/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/17/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
|
|
|
|
05/08/2024
|
First Conference Committee Result was to Corrected Report Amending Rerevised Bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2024
|
House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2024
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
|
|
|