Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB065 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 24, 2024
Fiscal Note May 6, 2024
Fiscal Note February 7, 2024
Bill January 19, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 15, 2024
Bill March 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2024

Amended

Bill May 5, 2024
Bill May 4, 2024