06/05/2024 | Governor Signed | |||
05/03/2024 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 05/03/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/07/2024 - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |