Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB068 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 17, 2024
Fiscal Note March 21, 2024
Fiscal Note February 26, 2024
Bill January 22, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2024
Bill March 7, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 23, 2024

Amended

Bill April 9, 2024
Bill April 5, 2024