04/04/2024 | Governor Signed | |||
03/28/2024 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 03/28/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |