Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB071 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 28, 2024
Fiscal Note January 30, 2024
Bill January 22, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 9, 2024
Bill February 8, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 27, 2024

Amended

Bill March 25, 2024
Bill March 22, 2024