Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB071 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/25/2024

                    Second Regular Session
Seventy-fourth General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
REREVISED
This Version Includes All Amendments
Adopted in the Second House
LLS NO. 24-0220.01 Alana Rosen x2606
SENATE BILL 24-071
Senate Committees House Committees
Education Education
A BILL FOR AN ACT
C
ONCERNING INCLUDING SEASONAL OUTDOOR ADVENTURE DAY CAMP101
PROGRAMS IN THE DEFINITION OF CHILDREN 'S RESIDENT CAMPS.102
Bill Summary
(Note:  This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
http://leg.colorado.gov
.)
The bill defines "seasonal outdoor adventure day camp program"
(program) as a type of children's resident camp for licensing purposes or
to ensure the programs are licensed. Programs serve children who are 5
years of age or older.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
HOUSE
3rd Reading Unamended
March 25, 2024
HOUSE
2nd Reading Unamended
March 22, 2024
SENATE
3rd Reading Unamended
February 9, 2024
SENATE
2nd Reading Unamended
February 8, 2024
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Fenberg and Rich, Cutter, Exum, Fields, Hansen, Marchman, Michaelson Jenet, Priola,
Rodriguez
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
Amabile and Soper, Bird, Brown, Duran, English, Froelich, Garcia, Lindsay, Lukens,
Marshall, Mauro, McCormick, McLachlan, Parenti, Ricks, Snyder, Willford, Young
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law.
Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 26.5-5-303, amend1
(5); and add (25.5) as follows:2
26.5-5-303.  Definitions. As used in this part 3, unless the context3
otherwise requires:4
(5) (a)  "Children's resident camp" means a facility operating for5
three or more consecutive twenty-four-hour days during one or more6
seasons of the year for the care of five or more children. The facility has7
as its purpose a group living experience offering education and8
recreational activities in an outdoor environment. The recreational9
experiences may occur at the permanent camp premises or on trips off the10
premises THAT OFFERS GROUP LIVING EXPERIENCES OR SEASONAL11
OUTDOOR ADVENTURE DAY CAMP PROGRAMS FOR FIVE OR MORE12
CHILDREN. THE PURPOSE OF THE FACILITY IS TO OFFER AN OUTDOOR13
EXPERIENCE FOR YOUTH DEVELOPMENT THROUGH MULTIPLE14
EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES IN AN OUTDOOR	,15
NATURE-BASED ENVIRONMENT. THE RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES OCCUR AT16
A PERMANENT FACILITY OR ON TRIPS OFF THE PREMISES .17
(b) (I)  A children's resident camp serves children who have18
completed kindergarten or are six years of age or older through children19
younger than nineteen years of age; except that a person nineteen years20
of age or twenty years of age may attend a children's resident camp if,21
within six months prior to attending the children's resident camp, the22
person has attended or has graduated from high school.23
(II)  N
OTWITHSTANDING THE PROVISIONS OF SUBSECTION (5)(b)(I)24
OF THIS SECTION, A CHILDREN'S RESIDENT CAMP THAT OFFERS SEASONAL25
OUTDOOR ADVENTURE DAY CAMP PROGRAMS SERVES CHILDREN WHO ARE26
FIVE YEARS OF AGE OR OLDER.27
071
-2- (25.5)  "SEASONAL OUTDOOR ADVENTURE DAY CAMP PROGRAM "1
MEANS A PROGRAM THAT OPERATES FOR AT LEAST SIX HOURS A DAY , ON2
A SEASONAL BASIS, PRIMARILY DURING THE SUMMER AND WINTER3
MONTHS, FOR A NUMBER OF DAYS SPECIFIC TO THE APPROVED4
REGISTRATION OF SEASONAL OUT DOOR ADVENTURE DAY CAMP5
PARTICIPANTS. SEASONAL OUTDOOR ADVENTURE DAY CAMP PROGRAMS6
SERVE CHILDREN WHO ARE FIVE YEARS OF AGE OR OLDER .7
SECTION 2. Safety clause. The general assembly finds,8
determines, and declares that this act is necessary for the immediate9
preservation of the public peace, health, or safety or for appropriations for10
the support and maintenance of the departments of the state and state11
institutions.12
071
-3-