House | 05/07/2024 | House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely | ||
House | 05/06/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance | ||
Senate | 05/04/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/26/2024 | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Finance | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |