Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB095 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 18, 2024
Fiscal Note May 7, 2024
Fiscal Note April 30, 2024
Fiscal Note February 29, 2024
Bill January 24, 2024

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2024
Bill May 3, 2024