House | 05/03/2024 | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Postpone Indefinitely | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/08/2024 - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/01/24 - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Committee on Local Government & Housing Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government & Housing |