Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB106 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 29, 2024
Fiscal Note April 10, 2024
Fiscal Note February 14, 2024
Bill February 5, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2024
Bill April 10, 2024