LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB125
Draft Versions
CO
Colorado Senate Bill SB125
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2024 Regular Session
Colorado Senate Bill SB125
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
July 23, 2024
Fiscal Note
March 5, 2024
Bill
February 6, 2024
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 13, 2024
Compare
Bill
March 12, 2024
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
April 26, 2024
Compare
Amended
Bill
April 22, 2024
Compare
Bill
April 21, 2024
Compare