Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/09/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/07/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/04/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/03/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/03/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/02/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/01/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/30/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/29/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/26/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/25/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/24/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/23/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/22/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/19/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|